Trustees THE PRINCE OF WALES YOUTH CLUB
Charity number: 302701

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALAN LINGHAM | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Samantha Myring | Trustee | 09 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alan Mepstead | Trustee | 04 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Darren John Ellis | Trustee | 14 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Bryony Wicks-Starling | Trustee | 16 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Richard Kemball-Cook | Trustee | 15 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Riki Samuel | Trustee | 12 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Susan Starling | Trustee | 19 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
KEVIN WOOD | Trustee | 20 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
JACQUELINE JACKSON-COX | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.