CHARTHAM HATCH VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Management of local village hall to provide facilities for local and other organisations relating to art and culture, sport and recreation, social and fund raising functions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
Total income includes £220 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kent
Governance
- 20 May 1969: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEVEN JOHN WASSELL | Chair | 27 April 2016 |
|
|||||
Lisa Adele Root | Trustee | 09 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jamie Stephen Pratt | Trustee | 09 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Davis | Trustee | 27 April 2016 |
|
|||||
Michael Robert Bantin | Trustee | 27 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
VALERIE JANE ELVIDGE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET POMFRET | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.26k | £18.93k | £18.23k | £11.74k | £13.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.74k | £19.13k | £20.24k | £21.32k | £8.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £14.47k | £10.67k | £737 | £220 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 08 January 2024 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 7TH DECEMBER 1968 AS AMENDED 19 OCTOBER 2006
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF CHARTHAM HATCH AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT IDSTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS AND IN PARTICULAR FOR USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
CHARTHAM HATCH AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
NEAMES
HOPPERS OAST
HATCH LANE
CHARTHAM HATCH
CANTERBURY
CT4 7LP
- Phone:
- 01227732393
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window