Accounts and annual returns CHATHAM MARINES CADET UNIT(UNIT 501 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS)

Charity number: 302710
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 22 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 04 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 21 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 14 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 07 February 2021 7 days late Download Open in new window