MEDWAY TOWNS UNIT 238 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Uniformed youth organisation providing training and adventurous actiivities for young people aged 10 to 17 years. Using a nautical theme based on the customs and traditions of the Royal Navy. Cadets can gain nationally recognised and accredited qualifications such as Royal Yachting Association, British Canoe Union, BTEC, D of E and much more.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Medway
Governance
- 20 January 1964: Standard registration
- MEDWAY TOWNS UNIT 238 SEA CADET CORPS (Previous name)
- MEDWAY TOWNS UNIT 28 SEA CADET CORPS (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ADRIAN COOKE | Chair | 03 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
Ian Sidebottom | Trustee | 03 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
COLONEL ANDREW WOOD | Trustee | 01 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
REV Paul Mathias | Trustee | 27 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
LT BUCK BUCKINGHAM | Trustee | 08 January 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.42k | £4.77k | £5.45k | £23.75k | £7.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.94k | £3.13k | £6.78k | £12.70k | £12.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SEA CADET REGULATIONS
Charitable objects
The charitable purpose of the Unit (the Purpose) is to promote the development of young people in achieving their physical, intellectual and social potential as individuals and as responsible citizens by the provision of education and leisure time activities using a nautical theme and in accordance with the principles, ethos and practices of the Marine Society & Sea Cadets (MSSC).
Area of benefit
THE MEDWAY TOWNS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Mary's House
Royal Sovereign Avenue
Chatham
Kent
ME4 4UP
- Phone:
- 01634822355
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window