CHIDDINGSTONE CAUSEWAY VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Village Hall hired by local clubs and for recreational activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kent
Governance
- 19 June 1963: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROWLAND JOHN POCOCK | Chair |
|
|
|||||
JOHN BALDOCK | Trustee | 05 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Ewer | Trustee | 13 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Foster | Trustee | 17 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Barnden | Trustee | 17 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
WENDY HOLLANDS | Trustee | 20 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
SUE KIBBLEWHITE | Trustee | 03 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
DENNIS RAYMOND WARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRYAN HOLLANDS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUE HEWLETT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £80.63k | £59.61k | £42.18k | £34.34k | £40.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.39k | £17.34k | £11.68k | £28.78k | £30.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £19.00k | £4.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 17 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 17 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 21 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 21 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 27 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 27 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 16TH MARCH 2004
Charitable objects
(1) THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR USE BY THE INHABITANTS OF THE AOB WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR: (A) MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND (B) OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS. (2) THE LAND IDENTIFIED IN PART 2 OF THE SCHEDULE TO THIS SCHEME MUST BE RETAINED BY COMMITTEE FOR USE FOR THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY.
Area of benefit
CHIDDINGSTONE CAUSEWAY AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 Richards Close
Chiddingstone Causeway
Tonbridge
TN11 8LF
- Phone:
- 01892870933
- Email:
- kibbs1@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window