Financial history THE BETTESHANGER SOCIAL WELFARE SCHEME

Charity number: 302727
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £199.96k £176.54k £207.12k £209.61k £261.42k
Total expenditure £155.24k £126.30k £193.18k £258.81k £274.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £42.45k N/A N/A N/A