Trustees EASTCHURCH VILLAGE HALL
Charity Number: 302730

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NICOLA DAWN WAGHORNE | Chair | 04 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Beal | Trustee | 06 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Tania Allen | Trustee | 13 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Poole | Trustee | 08 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julie Read | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Erica Smith | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
SARAH ELIZABETH POOLE | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Smith | Trustee | 15 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN HOPPER | Trustee | 01 October 2014 |
|
|||||
FRANCIS HARDMAN | Trustee | 10 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
MALCOLM AMOS NEWELL | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.