Financial history THE MEMORIAL HALL-FRITTENDEN

Charity number: 302746
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £107.00k £40.44k £191.78k £32.55k £37.15k
Total expenditure £6.46k £122.06k £232.45k £13.22k £12.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £5.00k £28.05k £17.71k £7.00k £17.99k