RAINHAM AND WIGMORE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides a community centre for recreation, education, sports, social and spiritual activities for use by groups and the local population.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Medway
Governance
- 04 October 1968: Standard registration
- OAST HOUSE COMMUNITY CENTRE (Working name)
- RAINHAM AND WIGMORE COMMUNITY CENTRE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lloyd Cooke | Chair | 15 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Wayne Spring | Trustee | 31 August 2023 |
|
|||||
Sarah Tyler | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Colin Paul Trevor Chapman | Trustee | 13 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Stephen Martin Claringbold | Trustee | 30 June 2019 |
|
|||||
Joyce Elizabeth Sanders | Trustee | 30 June 2019 |
|
|||||
Robin Halls | Trustee | 30 June 2019 |
|
|||||
Deborah Janice Gorman | Trustee | 30 June 2019 |
|
|||||
Katharina Maryjane Hickman | Trustee | 30 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jason Leon Liddiard | Trustee | 30 June 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £72.70k | £31.34k | £47.74k | £68.59k | £51.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £64.67k | £40.57k | £45.18k | £46.04k | £77.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £11.70k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 April 2025 | 155 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2023
(These accounts |
04 April 2025 | 155 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2024 | 360 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2022
(These accounts |
25 October 2024 | 360 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2024 | 725 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2021
(These accounts |
25 October 2024 | 725 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2022 | 331 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2022 | 331 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30/05/1968 AS AMENDED ON 02/04/1991 AS AMENDED ON 21/07/2014
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE BENEFICIAL AREA WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITES AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. (B) TO ESTABLISH OR TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE.
Area of benefit
RAINHAM AND WIGMORE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Rainham & Wigmore Community Centre
Granary Close
Rainham
GILLINGHAM
ME8 7SG
- Phone:
- 07495095169
- Email:
- secretary@oastcentre.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window