Financial history HALSTEAD VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 302757
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £19.78k £9.45k £29.41k £15.31k £18.55k
Total expenditure £15.40k £14.43k £15.46k £17.97k £23.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £18.24k £400 N/A