ST EDITH HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Village hall.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £6,775 from 2 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kent
Governance
- 28 December 1972: Standard registration
- THE ST EDITH HALL MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE (Working name)
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Janet Eaton | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rosie Withenshaw | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Philip Walker | Trustee | 18 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Paul Eaton | Trustee | 26 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
ELIZA JANE ECCLESTONE LLB DIP LP | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET ROBARTS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.03k | £24.69k | £23.87k | £29.69k | £34.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.27k | £42.30k | £29.64k | £32.06k | £31.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.80k | £15.10k | £2.98k | £3.13k | £6.78k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 March 2024 | 37 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 February 2021 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 2ND JUNE 1924
Charitable objects
A PARISH HALL, INSTITUTE AND READING ROOM AND FOR A WORKING MEN'S CLUB FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF KEMSING.
Area of benefit
KEMSING
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. EDITH HALL
HIGH STREET
KEMSING
SEVENOAKS
TN15 6NA
- Phone:
- 01732762841
- Email:
- st.edithhall@tiscali.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window