Financial history KINGSNORTH VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 302778
Charity reporting is up to date (42 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £19.56k £12.95k £11.70k £15.66k £26.81k
Total expenditure £17.34k £18.36k £17.85k £19.37k £25.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A £1.00k £4.00k