TRUST PROPERTY IN CONNECTION WITH LYDD YOUTH SET

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Pool,Music,Basketball,football,handicrafts,arts and crafts. Trips,ice skating,swimming,gocarting. Sexual health education,drug awareness.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 14 June 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 17 August 1970: Standard registration
- 09 December 2015: Removed (Does not operate)
- 12 March 2016: Re-registered
- LYDD YOUTH CLUB (Previous name)
- THE LYDD YOUTH SET (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicole Faulkner-Bechelli | Chair | 06 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Craig Bechelli | Trustee | 06 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Michelle Redshaw | Trustee | 06 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Derek Ellis | Trustee | 06 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Darren Clark | Trustee | 06 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Dave Usher | Trustee | 06 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Sandra Ellis | Trustee | 06 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Nicola Baldwin | Trustee | 06 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Margaret Rose Clifton | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 13/06/2021 | 13/06/2022 | 13/06/2023 | 13/06/2024 | 14/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.82k | £2.94k | £9.74k | £15.67k | £15.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.11k | £10.86k | £8.16k | £15.06k | £15.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 14 June 2024 | 13 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 13 June 2024 | 26 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 13 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 13 June 2023 | 20 June 2024 | 68 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 13 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 13 June 2022 | 05 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 13 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 13 June 2021 | 19 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 13 June 2021 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 11TH JUNE 1970
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSES OF HELPING AND EDUCATING GIRLS AND BOYS THROUGH THEIR LEISURE-TIME ACTIVITIES SO TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED NORMALLY LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
The old Granary
Manor Road
Lydd
Romney Marsh
Kent
TN29 9HT
- Phone:
- 07450378917
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window