Financial history MARGATE UNIT 235 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity number: 302798
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £17.62k £12.90k £28.61k £21.16k £24.76k
Total expenditure £14.61k £9.70k £14.35k £26.67k £30.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £10.67k N/A N/A