Trustees Otford Village Memorial Hall
Charity Number: 302815

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL JOHN FENWICK CARTER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Jeremy Peter Burden | Trustee | 11 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS JOHN BOWER | Trustee | 15 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Mary Stephenson | Trustee | 07 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dennis William Glasspool | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Katherine Nicholson | Trustee | 17 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
MRS ROS WARD | Trustee | 20 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
MRS PAT GODDARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DEREK WILLIAM BUCK | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.