Financial history PRESTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 302819
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Total gross income £14.56k £22.93k £11.12k £8.72k £9.16k
Total expenditure £14.56k £24.63k £11.41k £8.15k £11.62k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A