Financial history BLEAN VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 302829
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £36.52k £24.07k £37.99k £49.05k £58.19k
Total expenditure £25.88k £14.73k £33.27k £42.42k £35.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £8.00k £250 N/A N/A