Financial history SHELDWICH VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 302837
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £11.98k £631 £6.43k £7.83k £8.16k
Total expenditure £5.19k £9.70k £8.24k £6.00k £7.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A