Trustees SMARDEN VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 302844
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
GERALDINE DYER Chair 01 April 2016
None on record
Carly Mitchell Trustee 08 January 2025
None on record
Annie Jeffrey Trustee 08 January 2025
None on record
Clare Louise Walton Trustee 08 January 2025
None on record
Adam Derek Green Trustee 22 June 2024
None on record
Paul Ryan Trustee 01 January 2023
None on record
Mark Bickerton Trustee 02 June 2020
None on record
MICHAEL BARKWAY Trustee 01 January 2007
None on record
BRIAN MARTIN BRISTOW Trustee
None on record
ANGELA WILSON Trustee
None on record