Financial history TYLER HILL MEMORIAL HALL

Charity Number: 302872
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £27.35k £10.72k £32.37k £65.48k £60.78k
Total expenditure £52.35k £15.02k £19.99k £33.05k £60.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £4.43k £10.00k £8.23k N/A £788