Trustees TYLER HILL MEMORIAL HALL

Charity Number: 302872
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jonathan Antony Cane Trustee 25 April 2024
MAIDSTONE ORCHESTRAL SOCIETY
Received: On time
Peter Robert Smisson Trustee 25 April 2024
None on record
Alex Graham Trustee 25 April 2024
None on record
Maxine Stratton Trustee 25 April 2024
None on record
Jordan Coleman Trustee 25 April 2024
None on record
Elaine Cumming Trustee 11 May 2023
None on record
Christian Holness Trustee 08 September 2022
None on record
Victoria Samantha Tovey Trustee 13 October 2020
None on record
Paul David Huggins Trustee 01 April 2019
None on record
NIKKI CAROLINE RAYNER Trustee 18 July 2013
None on record
DIANA MARY SEEKINGS Trustee
None on record
JENNIFER SUSAN TAYLOR Trustee
None on record