Accounts and annual returns VILLAGE HALL UPCHURCH

Charity Number: 302873
Charity reporting is up to date (27 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 16 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 27 November 2024 27 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 01 November 2023 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 01 November 2023 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 28 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 12 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 16 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required