Financial history VILLAGE HALL UPCHURCH

Charity Number: 302873
Charity reporting is up to date (27 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £20.66k £10.61k £18.36k £29.52k £30.16k
Total expenditure £21.86k £14.75k £15.81k £25.42k £27.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £100 N/A £16.00k N/A N/A