WITTERSHAM SPORTS CLUB

Charity Number: 302890
Charity reporting is up to date (25 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Sports & recreational facilities and training to the local community.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £11,005
Total expenditure: £11,443

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Amateur Sport
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 March 1965: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • WITTERSHAM RECREATION GROUND (Working name)
  • WITTERSHAM RECREATION GROUND (Previous name)
  • WITTERSHAM SPORTS CLUB (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MIRANDA GOODHEAD Trustee 31 March 2022
None on record
Miriam Angela Lewis Trustee 16 September 2021
None on record
GAIL BARTLETT Trustee 30 April 2019
None on record
Charles Stuart Hibberd Trustee 27 March 2018
None on record
Adrian Delaney Trustee 27 March 2018
None on record
Ann Jeanette Beeching Trustee 07 September 2016
None on record
Brian Mervyn John Toogood Trustee 07 March 2016
None on record
PHILIP ADRIAN MAYNARD Trustee 07 March 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £7.90k £5.07k £9.48k £10.75k £11.01k
Total expenditure £10.04k £10.46k £9.36k £13.21k £11.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 25 November 2024 25 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 27 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 15 November 2022 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 11 November 2021 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 11 December 2020 41 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Pavillion
Poplar Road
Wittersham
TENTERDEN
TN30 7PD
Phone:
01797270487
Website:

No information available