BARNET SOUTH COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide facilities at our Hall for use by organizations covering all age groups.These include childrens Karate ,Bingo for pensioners etc.We have a Church that uses the Hall and we often let other charitable organizations use it for fundraising etc.The premises are for the use of a diverse range of people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2020
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Barnet
Governance
- 13 March 1963: Standard registration
- BARNET SOUTH COMMUNITY ASSN (Working name)
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NORMAN TERENCE WRAITH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
ANN BARBARA WRAITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
WALTER SCOTT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2016 | 30/09/2017 | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.35k | £7.97k | £845 | £2.27k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.64k | £8.80k | £374 | £1.89k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 282 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 282 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 648 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 648 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1013 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1013 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 14 March 2022 | 227 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 14 March 2022 | 592 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED 22 FEBRUARY 1952 AMENDED 31ST JANUARY 1972 AND 26TH NOVEMBER 1979 AND 31ST OCTOBER 2005.
Charitable objects
COMMUNITY CENTRE
Area of benefit
BARNET
Contact information
- Address:
-
BARNET SOUTH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
St Stephens Small Hall
Spring Close
BARNET
EN5 2ur
- Phone:
- 02084491100
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window