GEORGE PERCIVAL BAKER'S CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide a hall & accommodation in safe & secure surroundings, storage facilities & acceptable health & safety standards. Hire costs at level local residents have affordable facilities for young people. Scouts, dancing school facilities, Womens Institute, Crayford camera club & keep fit for elderly etc. Safe parking, good heating & lighting, & emergency equipment & guide lines. In addition to se
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bexley
- Kent
Governance
- 21 April 1963: Standard registration
- THE BAKER TRUST (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL JOHN REGAN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Shaun Michael Hetherington | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Kirsty Anne Regan | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julie Sutton | Trustee | 01 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
MRS D J HETHERINGTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.97k | £11.14k | £8.56k | £22.45k | £23.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.35k | £10.97k | £7.29k | £11.74k | £17.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 27.11.1980
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION, MAINTENANCE ORGANISATION AND COUNDUCT OF FACILITIES FOR THE PURPOSE OF HELPING AND EDUCATION PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS OLD.
Area of benefit
THE FORMER URBAN DISTRICT OF CRAYFORD (AS CONSTITUTED) ON 01
Contact information
- Address:
-
83 Little Heath Road
BEXLEYHEATH
DA7 5HL
- Phone:
- 01322 449066
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window