CHELSFIELD VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The hall is hired by the W.I.and Yoga classes and Freemasons aand an elderly persons club
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bromley
Governance
- 22 November 1962: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Janet Parsons | Trustee | 25 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
Bridget O'Donnell | Trustee | 12 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP LANE | Trustee | 26 February 2002 |
|
|
||||
DANIEL SLOAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.02k | £17.34k | £11.84k | £11.33k | £16.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.12k | £4.09k | £19.16k | £5.62k | £15.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £16.76k | £10.10k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 01 February 2024 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 30 January 2023 | 33 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 25 January 2022 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 25 March 2021 | 86 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1 SEPTEMBER 1947
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSES OF PHYSICAL AND MENTAL TRAINING AND RECREATION AND SOCIAL MORAL AND INTELLECTUAL DEVELOPMENT THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF READING AND RECREATION ROOMS, LIBRARY, LECTURES, CLASSES, RECREATIONS AND ENTERTAINMENTS OR OTHERWISE AS MAY BY FOUND EXPEDIENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF CHELSFIELD AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF CHELSFIELD AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Chelsfield Village Hall
Bucks Cross Road
ORPINGTON
BR6 7RL
- Phone:
- 07719778946
- Email:
- cvhlettings@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window