ORPINGTON VILLAGE HALL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides for religious, moral, social and intellectual welfare and rational recreation and amusement of the inhabitants and visitors to the Parish of Orpington, and to their friends.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bromley
- Kent
Governance
- 22 November 1977: Standard registration
- THE ORPINGTON HALLS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL CAVALLI | Chair |
|
||||||
Patricia Woodhouse | Trustee | 08 December 2021 |
|
|||||
John Parker | Trustee | 08 December 2021 |
|
|||||
RON SERVANT | Trustee | 09 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
MIKE SMART | Trustee | 18 October 2016 |
|
|||||
JULIE BAILEY | Trustee |
|
||||||
ROBERT GOWER | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £245.00k | £148.14k | £204.16k | £212.06k | £137.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £266.83k | £146.35k | £251.93k | £159.48k | £194.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £83.34k | £71.08k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 26 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2019
(These accounts |
14 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
INDENTURE DATED 31 DECEMBER 1896
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL PROVIDING FOR THE RELIGIOUS, MORAL, SOCIAL AND INTELLECTUAL WELFARE AND RATIONAL RECREATION AND AMUSEMENTS OF THE INHABITANTS, AND OF THE VISITORS TO THE PARISH OF ORPINGTON, AND THEIR FRIENDS.
Area of benefit
THE PARISH OF ORPINGTON AS AT 31 DECEMBER 1896
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 BEAUMONT ROAD
PETTS WOOD
ORPINGTON
BR5 1JN
- Phone:
- 01689873511
- Email:
- pamfrench508@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window