WEST THORNTON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education/Training Religious activities Sport/recreation
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2020
Total income includes £25,000 from 2 government grant(s)
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Croydon
- Surrey
Governance
- 08 September 1964: Standard registration
- W T C A (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRIS CAWTE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
COLVIN TROTMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.78k | £47.07k | £52.44k | £56.64k | £54.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £49.69k | £46.17k | £51.71k | £53.65k | £51.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £15.00k | £15.00k | N/A | £15.00k | £25.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 311 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 311 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 677 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 677 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1042 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1042 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 01 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 01 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 29 November 2020 | 152 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 29 November 2020 | 152 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED OCTOBER 1963
Charitable objects
COMMUNITY CENTRE
Area of benefit
CROYDON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 NORTHWOOD AVENUE
PURLEY
CR8 2EP
- Phone:
- 02086606252
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window