EDMONTON UNIT NO 126 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity Number: 303003
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Uniformed youth organization based on the Ethos & Traditions of the Royal Navy - Part of the Nationwide organization of the MS-SC.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £3,000
Total expenditure: £5,582

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Amateur Sport
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Enfield

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 June 1964: Standard registration
  • 09 September 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 22 September 2010: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • T S PLYMOUTH (Working name)
  • TS PLYMOUTH (Working name)
  • SEA CADET CORPS, EDMONTON UNIT NO 126 (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ms P Clear-Doughty Chair 25 May 2017
None on record
James Clear Tournas Trustee 01 June 2023
None on record
Captain John Lee David Trustee 19 June 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.36k £6.58k £3.11k £3.00k £3.00k
Total expenditure £7.22k £7.44k £4.93k £5.08k £5.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 20 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 22 May 2024 112 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 22 June 2023 142 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 30 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Edmonton Sea Cadets
Eco Park
4 Advent Way
LONDON
N18 3AG
Phone:
07595 298811