ST MARY HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hall Letting/ Furthering Religious Education
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bromley
Governance
- 14 May 1963: Standard registration
- ST MARY HALL TRUST (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sally Thorn | Trustee | 01 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Symes | Trustee | 01 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Carole Poll | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
KEITH HARRISON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.34k | £31.74k | £38.80k | £42.53k | £57.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.61k | £10.85k | £22.90k | £26.81k | £35.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 10 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 10 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 21 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 14 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
INDENTURE DATED 1ST FEBRUARY 1881 AND SCHEME OF THE 26TH FEBRUARY 1974
Charitable objects
TO BUILD AND MAINTAIN A CHURCH HALL FOR USE AS A SUNDAY SCHOOL, PARISH HALL, A WORKMENS'S CLUB AND OTHER INSTRUCTIONAL AND RECREATIONAL PURPOSES.
Area of benefit
ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF THE ANNUNCIATION, CHISLEHURST
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 FOXHOME CLOSE
CHISLEHURST
BR7 5XT
- Phone:
- 02084673606
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window