Trustees PRATTS BOTTOM VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 303033
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Clothier Trustee 08 November 2022
None on record
Richard Kerlogue Trustee 08 November 2022
None on record
Joyce Gosnell Trustee 08 February 2022
None on record
Neil McGrath Trustee 19 May 2021
None on record
John Stephenson Trustee 20 April 2021
None on record
LESLEY JONES Trustee 14 July 2013
None on record
JOHN HICKINBOTTOM Trustee 01 January 2001
None on record