Accounts and annual returns HAROLD HILL AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 303069
Charity reporting is overdue by 187 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 187 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 187 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 13 February 2025 471 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 13 February 2025 471 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 13 February 2025 836 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 13 February 2025 836 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 26 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 26 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 12 August 2021 285 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 26 October 2021 360 days late Download Open in new window