Financial history HAROLD HILL AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 303069
Charity reporting is overdue by 187 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £109.62k £118.74k £82.04k £123.11k £147.14k
Total expenditure £107.67k £91.24k £41.89k £98.38k £135.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £27.18k £25.57k N/A