Financial history FASSNIDGE MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity number: 303078
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £120.49k £125.84k £129.76k £155.33k £162.43k
Total expenditure £160.59k £174.60k £245.34k £157.69k £156.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A