Trustees FASSNIDGE MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity number: 303078
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Adam Bennett Chair 15 April 2021
THE KATE FASSNIDGE MEMORIAL CHARITY
Received: On time
John Hensley Trustee 15 January 2025
THE KATE FASSNIDGE MEMORIAL CHARITY
Received: On time
Kamal Preet Kaur Trustee 15 January 2025
THE KATE FASSNIDGE MEMORIAL CHARITY
Received: On time
Dr Reva GUDI Trustee 20 September 2023
THE KATE FASSNIDGE MEMORIAL CHARITY
Received: On time
Connor Liberty Trustee 17 May 2023
THE KATE FASSNIDGE MEMORIAL CHARITY
Received: On time
James Attias Trustee 26 January 2022
THE KATE FASSNIDGE MEMORIAL CHARITY
Received: On time
Johanna Marren-King Trustee 15 April 2021
THE KATE FASSNIDGE MEMORIAL CHARITY
Received: On time
REETA CHAMDAL Trustee 13 May 2020
THE KATE FASSNIDGE MEMORIAL CHARITY
Received: On time
KELLY MARTIN Trustee 13 May 2020
THE KATE FASSNIDGE MEMORIAL CHARITY
Received: On time