HAREFIELD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bowls, Dancing, Judo, Keep Fit, Line Dancing, Tea Dancing
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Buckinghamshire
- Hertfordshire
- Hillingdon
Governance
- 25 May 1967: Standard registration
- HCA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Patricia Ann Swindells | Chair | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Debbie Mabbs | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Weintroub | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Brian Richards | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Dickinson | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Toms | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sylvia Gard | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Ind | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lorraine Clare Monahan | Trustee | 13 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
BRENDA DAVIS | Trustee | 13 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Marjorie Bernice Ward | Trustee | 29 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.66k | £26.46k | £24.09k | £26.75k | £45.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.88k | £25.42k | £22.01k | £30.72k | £32.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £16.04k | £3.49k | £500 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 21 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15TH MAY 1967 AS AMENDED 24TH JUNE 1976, 21ST MARCH 1991 AND 20TH SEPTEMBER 1996
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF HAREFIELD (MIDDLESEX) AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX SEXUAL ORIENTATION RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. (B) TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A "COMMUNITY CENTRE" (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE CENTRE") AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS. (C) TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED.
Area of benefit
THE PARISH OF HAREFIELD AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
HAREFIELD COMMUNITY CENTRE
PRIORY AVENUE
HAREFIELD
UXBRIDGE
UB9 6AP
- Phone:
- 01895824621
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window