Trustees HAREFIELD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 303079

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Patricia Ann Swindells | Chair | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Debbie Mabbs | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Weintroub | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Brian Richards | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Dickinson | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Toms | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sylvia Gard | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Ind | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lorraine Clare Monahan | Trustee | 13 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
BRENDA DAVIS | Trustee | 13 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Marjorie Bernice Ward | Trustee | 29 September 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.