THE HAYES AND HARLINGTON COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 303081
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

provision of general social and community services

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £280,018
Total expenditure: £234,656

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Hillingdon

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 July 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • Hayes and Harlington Community Association (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Financial Conduct Authority
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Leon Jeanmonod Trustee 12 April 2019
None on record
William Hart Trustee 12 April 2019
None on record
Paul Evans Trustee 12 April 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £93.24k £68.15k £57.90k £128.91k £280.02k
Total expenditure £78.50k £56.37k £69.71k £149.47k £234.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £25.00k £32.62k £13.00k £14.12k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 16 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 16 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 17 November 2023 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 17 November 2023 17 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 27 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 09 November 2021 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 01 March 2022 121 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 02 November 2021 367 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 01 March 2022 486 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
COMMUNITY CENTRE
ALBERT ROAD
HAYES
UB3 4HR
Phone:
02085735273
Website:

No information available