WEST DRAYTON YOUTH FOOTBALL AND SPORTS CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a youth and children's football club that provides football management and coaching to boys and girls from 6 to 16 years old, along with "Little Kickers" under 6 engagement sessions. The children then participate in matches at the weekend representing the club. We also have various sporting activities that utilise the facilities in the evenings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
13 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hillingdon
Governance
- 30 January 1967: Standard registration
- WEST DRAYTON YOUTH FOOTBALL CLUB (Working name)
- WEST DRAYTON BOYS CLUB (Previous name)
- YIEWSLEY AND WEST DRAYTON BOYS CLUB (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul William Mallows | Chair | 01 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Alan John Catlin | Trustee | 20 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Nikki Louise Martin | Trustee | 20 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Daniels | Trustee | 20 July 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.75k | £21.75k | £24.36k | £22.58k | £23.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.10k | £23.10k | £24.79k | £21.21k | £18.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 February 2025 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 April 2024 | 72 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 April 2024 | 437 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 April 2024 | 802 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 March 2021 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 6TH DECEMBER 1966. LEASE DATED 6TH DECEMBER 1966. CONSTITUTION DATED 18TH NOVEMBER 1953. ENDORSEMENT DATED 12 DECEMBER 1969. CONSTITUTION DATED 6TH MARCH 2008.
Charitable objects
TO HELP AND EDUCATE BOYS, GIRLS, YOUNG MEN AND YOUNG WOMEN RESIDENT IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF HILLINGDON SO TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL, SPIRITUAL AND SOCIAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF HILLINGDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 Little Sutton Lane
SLOUGH
SL3 8AN
- Phone:
- 01753901842
- Email:
- PAULMALLOWS@AOL.COM
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window