Accounts and annual returns INTERNATIONAL SELF REALIZATION HEALING ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1069261
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 08 January 2008 21 June 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 08 January 2008 Not Required
Annual return 08 January 2007 20 September 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 08 January 2007 Not Required
Annual return 08 January 2006 25 August 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 08 January 2006 25 August 2006 On Time
Annual return 07 January 2005 11 January 2006 65 days late
Accounts and TAR 07 January 2005 Not submitted
Annual return 07 January 2004 02 September 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 07 January 2004 02 September 2004 On Time