FRIENDS OF CORFE CASTLE SURGERY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide a service taking and collecting people to and from the surgery/hospital as and when needed
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Dorset
Governance
- 01 September 1998: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jonathan Hertslet Lawrence Phillips | Chair | 13 June 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.84k | £269 | £0 | £625 | £2.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.86k | £142 | £0 | £413 | £1.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 19 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 16 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 14 JULY 1998
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS OF PATIENTS OF THE CORFE CASTLE SURGERY, IN THE COUNTY OF DORSET, AND THE PROVISION OF TRANSPORT, EQUIPMENT AND OTHER AMENITIES AND GENERALLY TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE SAID SURGERY
Area of benefit
CORFE CASTLE
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE SPINNEY
SPRINGBROOK CLOSE
CORFE CASTLE
WAREHAM
BH20 5HS
- Phone:
- 01929481271
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window