THE TRIANGLE ADVENTURE PLAYGROUND ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
It is the Association's purpose to service, fund and maintain the Triangle Adventure Playground for the benefit of young people between the ages of 6 and 17. The Associations primary aim is to provide a safe and secure environment in which all young people of the Oval community may develop personal and social skills through creative interaction in enjoyable and active play
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £80,805 from 5 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Lambeth
Governance
- 11 September 1969: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALAN SUTTON | Chair | 24 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Heath | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lady Susanna Mary Lyell | Trustee | 05 October 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £124.65k | £248.87k | £228.06k | £233.53k | £371.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £127.19k | £171.37k | £176.76k | £206.91k | £194.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £19.91k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £9.03k | £38.91k | £61.91k | £65.99k | £80.81k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 21ST MAY 1957 AS AMENDED 25TH MAY 1982 AND 28TH JUNE 1984 as amended on 17 Jan 2022
Charitable objects
TO ESTABLISH AN ADVENTURE PLAYGROUND VIZ A PLAYGROUND WHERE MOVEABLE EQUIPMENT, TOOLS AND MATERIALS ARE PROVIDED WITH A VIEW TO CONTRIBUTING TO THE HEALTH, WELL BEING AND HAPPINESS OF CHILDREN GENERALLY AND PROMOTING THEIR EDUCATIONAL, PHYSICAL AND EMOTIONAL DEVELOPMENT THROUGH A WIDE RANGE OF RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES, THE AGE-GROUP TO BE INITIALLY 3-11 YEARS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Triangle Adventure Playground
Ashmole Street
LONDON
SW8 1NF
- Phone:
- 07900475143
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window