Accounts and annual returns TWICKENHAM UNIT 341 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity number: 303195
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 20 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 20 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 16 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 16 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 18 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 18 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 27 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 27 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 07 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 07 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window