Trustees TWICKENHAM UNIT 341 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity Number: 303195
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Christopher McLaughlin Chair 08 January 2018
TWICKENHAM UNIT 341 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS CIO
Recently registered
Stephen Ilett Trustee 19 December 2024
TWICKENHAM UNIT 341 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS CIO
Recently registered
KIM PARKER Trustee 23 August 2024
TWICKENHAM UNIT 341 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS CIO
Recently registered
Roger Middleton Trustee 19 March 2024
TWICKENHAM UNIT 341 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS CIO
Recently registered
Nick Beynon Trustee 01 February 2019
TWICKENHAM UNIT 341 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS CIO
Recently registered
Janet Cane Trustee 01 November 2016
TWICKENHAM UNIT 341 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS CIO
Recently registered
Kirsten Clark Trustee 30 December 2015
TWICKENHAM UNIT 341 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS CIO
Recently registered
MR Steve Ilett Trustee 30 June 2015
TWICKENHAM UNIT 341 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS CIO
Recently registered