TWICKENHAM BRUNSWICK CLUB FOR YOUNG PEOPLE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The club provides two evenings for young people 8-18 with sports, arts, crafts and IT opportunities. It provides two sport-focussed clubs, one an ABA Boxing Club a valuable resource to the wider community the other an ETTA Table Tennis Club with England ranked players. The Disabilities club encourages integration with mainstream activities, including fundraising and leadership.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Richmond Upon Thames
Governance
- 13 September 1963: Standard registration
- 08 September 2014: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 08 September 2014: Funds transferred to 1152727 TWICKENHAM BRUNSWICK CLUB FOR YOUNG PEOPLE
- TWICKENHAM BRUNSWICK (CLUB FOR YOUNG PEOPLE) (Previous name)
- TWICKENHAM BRUNSWICK BOYS' CLUB (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £74.79k | £69.79k | £71.20k | £66.72k | £131.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £69.53k | £69.42k | £63.95k | £64.36k | £130.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 31 July 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | 31 July 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 23 July 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 23 July 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 12 July 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 12 July 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 15 August 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 15 August 2011 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED 13TH JUNE 1949 AS AMENDED 16TH OCTOBER 1962, 1ST FEBRUARY 1996, 29TH SEPTEMBER 2000, 2 JULY 2005 AND 7 JULY 2007.
Charitable objects
TO HELP AND EDUCATE BOYS AND YOUNG MEN AND GIRLS AND YOUNG WOMEN RESIDENT IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF RICHMOND-UPON-THAMES SO TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL, SPIRITUAL AND SOCIAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY. TWICKENHAM BRUNSWICK MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE WILL SUPPORT YOUNG PERSONS AND WORK TO FURTHER THEIR INVOLVEMENT.
Area of benefit
TWICKENHAM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window