THE WHITTON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides Social, Recreational & Educational facilities for the people of the Whitton area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Richmond Upon Thames
Governance
- 04 May 1968: Standard registration
- 01 May 2024: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 01 May 2024: Funds transferred to 1199321 WHITTON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2019 | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £197.23k | £211.14k | £175.07k | £241.53k | £237.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £211.43k | £211.54k | £172.35k | £210.78k | £226.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £5.45k | £1.29k | £834 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £58.00k | £58.00k | £139.89k | £12.79k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 04 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 25 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 25 February 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11TH MARCH 1966 AND AMENDED 12TH OCTOBER 1982 AS AMENDED 8TH NOVEMBER 1991
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF WHITTON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. (2) TO ESTABLISH OR TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE.
Area of benefit
WHITTON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window