THE WALTER THEODORE COLES MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support for children out of school (and their parents), especially support for children who are school phobic, truanting, or who have been permanently excluded from school. Support consists of education advice, behaviour management, tuition and help with future educational placements.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bristol City
- Croydon
- Lambeth
- Lewisham
- Southwark
Governance
- 07 February 1972: Standard registration
- ST BRENDANS EDUCATIONAL CENTRE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Katharine Pinney | Trustee | 06 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Iona Evelyn Coles | Trustee | 18 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Tidboald Coles | Trustee | 15 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Piers Messum | Trustee | 27 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
ALFRED THEODORE COLES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT TREVELYAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.51k | £2.31k | £3.31k | £3.25k | £3.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £850 | £716 | £1.97k | £1.35k | £1.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 18 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 25 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 27 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 06 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 20TH DECEMBER 1971
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND FACILITIES FOR SAFE AND SATISFYING GROUP PLAY FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN BETWEEN THE AGES OF 2 AND 5 YEARS AND TO SUPPORT EXPAND AND DEVELOP THE BRANDON STREET NURSERY SCHOOL FINANCIALLY AND OTHERWISE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
SHIRLEY COTTAGE
BEECHEN CLIFF ROAD
BATH
BA2 4QS
- Phone:
- 07905264762
- Email:
- alf.coles@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window