THE CLOUDS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
supply of Rene caisse herbal tea for the benefit of general public
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hampshire
Governance
- 09 September 1997: Standard registration
- CLOUDS TRUST (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALAN HALLESY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JEAN COULTHARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAULINE LINDA HALLESY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.04k | £25.46k | £16.94k | £12.10k | £12.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.99k | £29.15k | £25.54k | £24.78k | £20.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 15 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 01 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 03 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 03 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 09 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 09 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 4 AUGUST 1997
Charitable objects
1) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THROUGH ALTERNATIVE MEDICINE AND THERAPIES 2) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE TERMINALLY ILL BY THE PROVISION OF A CARE SERVICE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO Box 302
Petersfield
GU32 9HB
- Phone:
- 01730301162
- Email:
- info@cloudstrust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window