WADHAM LODGE SPORTS GROUND TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides football and indoor recreational facilities for residents within 20 miles of Waltham Forest Town Hall. The Charity also provides grants to support football training and other learning facilities for local young people from the borough of Redbridge
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Essex
- Redbridge
- Tower Hamlets
- Waltham Forest
Governance
- 31 July 1961: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LAWRENCE STUART MALLINSON | Trustee | 12 May 2006 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT BELAM | Trustee | 12 May 1998 |
|
|
||||
DAVID ERNEST WARD | Trustee | 12 March 1996 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Lock | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.51k | £41.85k | £22.93k | £24.05k | £28.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £43.80k | £30.00k | £8.20k | £14.93k | £9.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £30.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2025 | 365 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 March 2023 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 November 2022 | 295 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 January 2022 | 337 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 31 JULY 1961
Charitable objects
RECREATION GROUND.
Area of benefit
RADIUS OF 20 MILES OF THE WALTHAMSTOW TOWN HALL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wadham Lodge Sports Ground Trust
Wadham Lodge Sports Ground
Kitchener Road
Walthamstow
London
E17 4LL
- Phone:
- 07932105134
- Email:
- lawrence@jameswhite.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window